Hello my dear brothers and sisters. In this presentation I am going to show you a fastest method of multiplication better I will say, mental multiplication or finger multiplication system, the power of five fingers for fast multiplication. Well So, you are going to learn to multiply any digit number 2 digit number, 3 digit number, 5 digit number any digit number, doesn’t matter multiply by 11 right way in figners you can solve literally or even in the brain even if you don’t have pen or papers for writing and multiplying.. easily you can calculate. do you want to see the example ? 7 times 11=77, everybody know 3 times 11=33 let’s say 35 times 11 so how much it’s going to be ? 385, right ? So, now let’s take a 3 digit number 715 7865 now 4 digit number 4444=4884 all right ? 4884 now 5 digit number 12345, ok ? 135795 let’s take one more 5 digit number as an example let’s say 23451 257961 like that you know, you can multiply any digit number I just have 5 fingers in one hand, you know … If i have more than I can use them tooo so the fast trick I am going to tell you now how to multiply any digit number by 11 First one wan to go by one digit number ok ? Whenever you have any one digit number and that you need to multiply by 11 let’s say 2 times 11 so its very simple 9 times 11 is 99 just wanted to say if its one digit number then what is that number ? if its 2 then write 22 if its 9 then write 99 if its 3 then write 33 if its 4 then write 44 And, now if its 2 digit number for the two digit numbers , it is again easy to multiply fast one of the coolest trick i am going to give you let’s say 24 times 11 to find out see… the trick is – this is your first digit and this is your 2nd digit right ? What you have to do, is just add both of this add 2 plus 4 it will be like 2 and then plus 4 264 let’s say you have 36 can you tell me the answer ? Yes, 3 + 6=9 right ? let’s say you have 4 and 5 times 11 then what are you going to do ? 4 +5=9 so 495 that’s it let’s say you have 63, ok ? 63 times 11, what are you going to do ? 6 + 3=9 so 6 9 3 that’s it but sometime , what if the numbers are bigger than 10 let’s say 6 8 right ? 6 + 8=14 how much it is ? of course it is 14 So its gonna be 748 simple just take that extra number to the frontal side, ok ? I will give you one more easier way ok ? now this is the perfect one like .. let’ say you have 81 time 11 then write this one here and how much is 8 + 1, that is 9 ok ? then 891 so now in the same concept, let’s say we have here 82, all right ? We have 82 times 11 so first you have to write 2 which i wrote and two plus 8 how much it is , 10 10s zero here and one will be carry over so 8 plus one , that’s 9 902 in the same way let’s go you have to multiply 89 times 11 first you will write 9 here then 9 plus 8 17 right ? 17th’s 7 and one more will be carried and that will be added in this 8 so it will be 979 simple ok ? Now let’s go for 3 digit number. If you have 3 digit number and that 3 digit number you want to fast multiply by 11 so , the same trick we are going to followagain let’s say any 3 digit number 234 times 11 so, how are we going to do ? exactly as I told you first you are going to write this then 4 plus 3 , how much its 7, right ? and then 3 plus 2 , how much ? 5 right ? and then 2, the last one as it is 2 574, that’s our answer ok now , let’s do another one 2436 times 11 I am going from simple to complex, ok ? so don’t worry … sit calm and just see the trick of doing fast mental multiplication so 6 you are going to write here So, the calculation can be very fast if you follow the trick ok ? so , try to remember this method right ? all the time you have to go from right hand side to the left hand side by adding I hope you understand this trick of fast multiplying

bullshit………..

it very helpful thanks you

it is very helpful thanks you

Well explained!π

https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=8_Be-yl2rso

Bro, thanks

rey pilla pulka entadi?

jiddu my son

mg better

it doesn't work always

Very impressive

how to multiply any number with 111, 1111, etc

but what happend if 11 is not there

Hey bro, why must 11? Why not 12, 13, 64 or 68 why?

Awesome tricks

why you don't teach in sharjah your so good thanks for ur help

Just Use this Trick

and Thankyou for Video. Good Luck Brother.

Yrghegeu

Isow$#<Γ·*

21 to 30 tak ki koi trick batao

Dnt make these type of faces it will anger me π

Saale..dont make ur face like chutiya

India is lacking behind

whoa!Now i am smart as my Dad!!

I dissent anderstand any thingππΏ

How is it works

I donβt understand it at all

Wow what a trick

Whatv0

India crazy

Suprb vdeo sir it's so helpful 4 me in my xam

Sir kya aap apni trick se 34Γ17 kr skte ho plzlzl

this numbers can multiple only 9 or any another Number π€π€π€π€π€π€

how it would be done by finger

π

very easiest way to do 3 digit multiplication click the following link https://youtu.be/BKAbSshwqGU in hindi………….

This is confusing

He is a fuckin dolt….

Bihari h na bc…

U didn't explain how u use that!!π€π€π€

doesent work . useless

Bro can't understand. LOL

Thanks so much π

I understood your tutorials from the start. I didn't notice anything wrong with your accent. So don't worry about anyone who can't focus on learning because of an "accent".

EVERY BIT OF LEARNING IS VALUABLE . THANKS .

Madrchod

Bro I dont even get this!_

______________You are a perfect example when someone tries to do fake accent . Be proud who you are dont fake it!

Nice

Thanks you helped allot even if itβs just 11βa

Thank you u.you are the broπ₯π₯π₯π₯

You are talented

this is only by 11, *C L I C K B A I T *

so confusing /+=-5_+A(^&6%8+???

Happy holi my friends

Cool !

I like fast math tricks given by Smart Bunny – a new app with funny rebbit π my children like it very much

It was really helpful

https://pk2h.app.link/zJ01IX8zpL

I think this is bad video…becoz We need multiply by every no. But u r multiplying only with 11. If u can multiply by every no. Not only 11 then u r genius in the world.

Tora mai ke chodo

Good

123456789Γ72

Title doesnt match with u are video i was not nice video

IDIOT U WROTE FOR EVERY NUMBER

thanks bro

thanks

Great

Only 11 digit number change in number

every time multiply with the 11 so your title is wrong

Aurther Benjamin method

Pin This For More Math

Rata

Solve this 10000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000000Γ999999999999999999999999999999999999999999999999999999999999999999999999999999999999999999

cool

And your all questions solve on 9 digit for last please my request another number 2,3,4,5,6,7,8, uploads new vedio

What a nonsense . why with 11 only? bullshit. waste of time

Over action

8:55 its like you've drawn a human facing sidewards

see why in https://youtu.be/CJKSItr7wT0

Huh?

Really bad

That was cool

Omg thanks

asshole

wath is 8 3

Can u plz show ..how to multpl three factors in 1-12

first i was so lazy in maths now i am also lazy and i study in 7 class because i saw your video now i am topper of my class. thank you much sir.

Perfect teaching bro π

Chutiya post h Abbey maderchod

Ee yedavaki cheppadanike ravadam ledu. Paiga navvokati

What is Fibe

I am confused

Solve 2679502/43 and 133342/114 by short-cut method

So you want to mislead people obviously didn't mention it is only by 11? OK. THUMBS DOWN. REPORT. AND SELECT8NG NOT INTERESTED IN THIS CHANNEL. That's what you get, learn to be honest and not deceiving.

you are fake

https://youtu.be/F7xy3SXTncc

roses are

red

violets are

blue

what ever you do

asians are better than you

Speec hindi

Am i the only one trying to do 4 digit?

Nirale.sir

liked the vid, very good, easy and memorable. thanks.

solve it 375*11 by this method

Thanks so much you are a mathematician

πππππππππππππππππππππβΊβΊβΊβΊπβΊπβΊ ππ